This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 17:48:28 (UTC).

BYUNG C CHO -V- JULIAN RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 BYUNG C CHO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JULIAN RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0789

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYUNG C CHO

Defendant

JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170615-0719 $25.00; 170615-0719-CK Reference Number 4648

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO ORDERED ENTERED 06/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BYUNG C CHO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $287.41 AND DAMAGES $975.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,762.41; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BYUNG C CHO PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER PAIK COOK IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET KOREAN/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 300977 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- BYUNG CHO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR BYUNG C CHO; JUDGMENT AGAINST JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,500.00, INTEREST $0.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COSTS $287.41, AND DAMAGES $975.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,762.41; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/25/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/25/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III; PARTY SERVED ON 04/25/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III; PARTY SERVED ON 04/25/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/28/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/28/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/28/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/28/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170411-0680 $287.41; 170411-0680-VS Reference Number 026-0025993677

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0427 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • WRIT FWD TO SCS THIS DATE (WITH CK/INSTRUCTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170615-0719 $25.00; 170615-0719-CK Reference Number 4648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/10/2017 OF BYUNG CHO ORDERED ENTERED 06/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BYUNG C CHO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $287.41 AND DAMAGES $975.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,762.41; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • JUDGMENT AND WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170608-0356 $25.00; 170608-0356-DB Reference Number 026-0051019421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170608-0358 $1.00; 170608-0358-DB Reference Number 026-0051019421

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • RETURNED NTC TO DEF OF FILING GIVEN TO DEFENDANT A T COUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JULIAN RODRIGUEZ III FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170424-0557 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ** VOID ** LIMITED UNLAWFUL DET FEE UP TO 10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170412-0567 $287.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170411-0680 $287.41; 170411-0680-VS Reference Number 026-0025993677

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.