This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:15:22 (UTC).

BYRD -V- SUPERIOR HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 BYRD filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SUPERIOR HOMES LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1425

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,

Defendants

DAVID A. WILLIAMS

SUPERIOR HOMES LLC

GLENN R. TRAVIS

SUPERIOR COURT FORTHE VALLEY DIVISON,

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CUMMINGS,MCCLOREY,DAVIS,ACHO &ASSOCIATES

3801 University Ave Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPO TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF.

NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPO TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE (NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT) FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE (NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT) FILED.

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER MCINTIRE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER MCINTIRE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF; REPRESENTED BY CUMMINGS,MCCLOREY,DAVIS,ACHO &ASSOCIATES(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF; REPRESENTED BY CUMMINGS,MCCLOREY,DAVIS,ACHO &ASSOCIATES(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID A. WILLIAMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID A. WILLIAMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GLENN R. TRAVIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GLENN R. TRAVIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPERIOR HOMES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPERIOR HOMES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 4/30/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER A. MCINTIRE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:58; COUNSEL INDICATES THAT NO AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED. NOTICE HAS BEEN RETURNED/UNOPENED.; DEFENSE HAS HAD NO CONTACT WITH PLAINTIFF.; DEFENSE REQUEST THE COURT DISMISS THE MATTER WITH PREJUDICE.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER DATED 1/17/18 RECEIVED BACK FROM FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER MCINTIRE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:03; COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF IS NOT PRESENT NOR HAVE THEY CONTACTED TO THE COURT AS TO NONAPPEARANCE.; MOTION; DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF'S MOTION /DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER SUSTAINED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,, WITH 30 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND.; LEAVE OF COURT GRANTED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD, FOR 30 DAYS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 04/30/18 CONFIRMED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 1/17/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPO TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE (NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES AND COURT REPORTER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $900.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER MCINTIRE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY DAVID A. WILLIAMS, SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF; REPRESENTED BY CUMMINGS,MCCLOREY,DAVIS,ACHO &ASSOCIATES(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,, SUPERIOR COURT FORTHE VALLEY DIVISON, REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD, IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON FOR THE TRUE, PROPER NAME WILLIAM BYRD, FOR FIRST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less