This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/04/2018 at 03:06:11 (UTC).

BURKETT -V- AFFORDABLE RENTALS

Case Summary

On 08/24/2012 BURKETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AFFORDABLE RENTALS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0325

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JME CATHRINE BURKETT

Appellant

JME CATHERINE BURKETT

Respondents, Defendants and Others

AFFORDABLE RENTALS

JME CATHERIN E BURKETT

Assignee

AFFORDABLE RENTALSET AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD M GHAN

55198 Twentynine Palms Highway Suite 1

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

Assignee Attorney

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC

441 N Varney St 2Nd Floor

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED 05.18.16 )

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED 05.18.16 )

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $800.00) FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $800.00) FILED.

ASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPT OF COUNSEL * FILED.

ASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPT OF COUNSEL * FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/24/2012 OF JME BURKETT FILED ADDING AFFORDABLE RENTALSET AL AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/24/2012 OF JME BURKETT FILED ADDING AFFORDABLE RENTALSET AL AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/14/13 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/14/13 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 09/25/2012 OF AFFORDABLE RENTALS FILED BY JME CATHERIN E BURKETT.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 09/25/2012 OF AFFORDABLE RENTALS FILED BY JME CATHERIN E BURKETT.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO JME CATHERIN E BURKETT. PARTY SERVED ON 09/28/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO JME CATHERIN E BURKETT. PARTY SERVED ON 09/28/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AFFORDABLE RENTALS (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AFFORDABLE RENTALS (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO AFFORDABLE RENTALS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $25.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO AFFORDABLE RENTALS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $25.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 160601-0115 $25.00; 160601-0115-CK Reference Number 60566

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED 05.18.16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $800.00) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $134.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $541.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPT OF COUNSEL * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/24/2012 OF JME BURKETT FILED ADDING AFFORDABLE RENTALSET AL AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/14/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/14/13 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120925-3454 $75.00; 120925-3454-MC Reference Number 025-0045935215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AFFORDABLE RENTALS (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO AFFORDABLE RENTALS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $25.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JME CATHRINE BURKETT FOR SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JME CATHRINE BURKETT IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JME CATHRINE BURKETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.