This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:49:54 (UTC).

BURBANK-V-BETTER BEVERAGES ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BURBANK-V-BETTER BEVERAGES was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7777

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTIN BURBANK

Defendants

RAYMOND GUERRERO

CESAR GUZMAN

BETTER BEVERAGES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAUN J. BAUMAN, THANOS SIMOUDIS

6800 Owensmouth Ave Suite 410

Canoga Park, CA 91303

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CESAR GUZMAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CESAR GUZMAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY BETTER BEVERAGES INC, CESAR GUZMAN.

NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY BETTER BEVERAGES INC, CESAR GUZMAN.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BETTER BEVERAGES INC SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BETTER BEVERAGES INC SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONSOLIDATION/ TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVDS1705799 & CIVDS1714662 MASTER FILE CIVDS1705799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVDS1714662 MASTER FILE CIVDS1705799; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DUPLICATE. DEFENDANT HAS ALREADY BEEN SERVED ON 09/27/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUSTIN BURBANK FOR FAX FEES FOR PROOF; Minutes; Receipt: 171121-0790 $2.00; 171121-0790-VS Reference Number 0330042377421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DEFENDANT BETTER BEVERAGES INC, CESAR GUZMAN FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BETTER BEVERAGES INC, CESAR GUZMAN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171017-0676 $870.00; 171017-0676-CK Reference Number 5199

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY BETTER BEVERAGES INC, CESAR GUZMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CESAR GUZMAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BETTER BEVERAGES INC SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUSTIN BURBANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0098 $435.00; 170914-0098-CK Reference Number D3566412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less