Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 22:20:50 (UTC).

BUNKER VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 BUNKER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2774

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BUNKER APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

JACQUELINE TORRES

RENE TORRES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER & MELLO

4676 Lakeview Ave Suite 201

Yorba Linda, CA 92886

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $170.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $170.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/25/2017 OF THE BUNKER APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 05/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE BUNKER APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JACQUELINE TORRES, RENE TORRES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JACQUELINE TORRES, RENE TORRES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RENE TORRES SERVED ON 04/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RENE TORRES SERVED ON 04/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JACQUELINE TORRES, RENE TORRES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JACQUELINE TORRES, RENE TORRES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JACQUELINE TORRES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JACQUELINE TORRES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/30/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/30/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170425-0699 $255.00; 170425-0699-CK Reference Number 88232

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/25/2017 OF THE BUNKER APARTMENTS, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: THE BUNKER APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JACQUELINE TORRES, RENE TORRES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $350.00 COSTS $315.00 AND DAMAGES $1,499.85.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,164.85; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON UD-116, #10 MUST BE COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $170.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • REQUEST TO SET TRIAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS HAVE NOT FILED ANY RESPONSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • RTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JACQUELINE TORRES FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170509-0730 $1.00; 170509-0730-CS Reference Number CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JACQUELINE TORRES FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170505-0778 $2.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170425-0699 $255.00; 170425-0699-CK Reference Number 88232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less