This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 15:06:05 (UTC).

BUCKLEY-V-MILFELD

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 BUCKLEY-V-MILFELD was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0559

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGINA BUCKLEY

Defendants

DOES 1-10

RON MILFELD

KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD

JOYCE MILFELD

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: UD DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; Disposition: Sustained

MOTION RE: UD DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:00; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF REGINA BUCKLEY PRESENT; DEFENDANT KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD, JOYCE MILFELD PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RON MILFELD; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; MOTION; RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD'S MOTION DEMURRER IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY REGINA BUCKLEY .; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; 3 DAY NOTICE DOES NOT COMPLY WITH CODE. NO PLACE OR TIME TO PAY PAST DUE RENT IS LISTED THEREFORE; 3 DAY NOTICE IS DEFECTIVE.; DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED AS TO DEFENDANT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/14/2017 OF REGINA BUCKLEY , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: 3 DAY NOTICE IS DEFECTIVE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 04/20/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED.THE; HEARING IS RESET FOR 4/06/17 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT B-1 ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR.; NOTICES PRINTED

DEMURRER FILED BY RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/18/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/18/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JOYCE MILFELD SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JOYCE MILFELD SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RON MILFELD; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/18/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RON MILFELD; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/18/17

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 03/24/17 AS TO REGINA BUCKLEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 03/24/17 AS TO REGINA BUCKLEY, FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0715 $255.00; 170314-0715-CK Reference Number 1312

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: UD DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:00; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF REGINA BUCKLEY PRESENT; DEFENDANT KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD, JOYCE MILFELD PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RON MILFELD; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; MOTION; RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD'S MOTION DEMURRER IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY REGINA BUCKLEY .; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; 3 DAY NOTICE DOES NOT COMPLY WITH CODE. NO PLACE OR TIME TO PAY PAST DUE RENT IS LISTED THEREFORE; 3 DAY NOTICE IS DEFECTIVE.; DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED AS TO DEFENDANT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/14/2017 OF REGINA BUCKLEY , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: 3 DAY NOTICE IS DEFECTIVE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING RECEIVED BACK FROM KELLER CARTER-MILFELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING RECEIVED BACK FROM RON MILFELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IMAGED (FEE WAIVER, ETC) RFA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 04/20/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED.THE; HEARING IS RESET FOR 4/06/17 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT B-1 ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: DEMURRER 04/20/17 SENT DEPARTMENT B1 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY RON MILFELD, KELLEE CARTER-MILFELD; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/18/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JOYCE MILFELD SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM RON MILFELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM KELLEE CARTER-MILFORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $46.67.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0715 $255.00; 170314-0715-CK Reference Number 1312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.