This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 18:34:35 (UTC).

BROUTSAS -V- CRESCENT HOTELS & RESORTS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/28/2015 BROUTSAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CRESCENT HOTELS RESORTS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sachs, Michael A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7635

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Sachs, Michael A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WAYNE BROUTSAS

BROUTSAS, WAYNE

Defendants

CRESCENT HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

LAKE ARROWHEAD RESORT & SPA

CRESCENT HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN NATURE

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAKE ARROWHEAD RESORT & SPA A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN NATURE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BOBNEHORAY

4311 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Nehoray, Babak

Defendant Attorney

GORDON & REES

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

633 West Fifth Street 52Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2007

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE- TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES S

12/09/2015: MOTION RE- TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES S

DECLARATION OF JARED R ZEIDMAN FILED

12/09/2015: DECLARATION OF JARED R ZEIDMAN FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED BY CRESCENT H

11/24/2015: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED BY CRESCENT H

ANSWER FILED BY MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; PART

07/16/2015: ANSWER FILED BY MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.; PART

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CRESCE

06/26/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CRESCE

NOTICE IMAGED

06/04/2015: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

06/04/2015: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

06/04/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE 8/25/16,NO APPEARANCE 9/28/16.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL(FTA 8/25/16) MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI;13302 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: 08:38 PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD CHRONOLOGY OF CASE STATED ON RECORD. COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE 8/25/16,NO APPEARANCE 9/28/16. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER 9/28/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS DISMISSED BY THE COURT ON 09/28/16 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL(FTA 8/25/16)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD 08:36 THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE, COURT VACATES TRIAL DATE CURRENTLY SET 8/29/16 AND SETS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL ON 9/28/16. - HEARINGS: VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(FTA 8/25/16) SET FOR 09/28/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER 8/25/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED BY DEFENDANT CRESCENT HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketCredit Card Transaction ID Number; Comment: CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0230463202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY WAYNE BROUTSAS FOR FAX FILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT 150604-0216-VS FAX/ 27.00 PAYMT 150604-0216-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 023-0230463202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150604-0210-VS CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 150604-0210-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 023-0230463202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,822.21; Total Payments and Credits: $1,822.21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where Crescent Hotels & Resorts LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant