This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:12:20 (UTC).

BROOKWOOD LOANS-V-THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 BROOKWOOD LOANS-V-THOMPSON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1753

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC

Defendant

ABDULLAH THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD J MURPHEY

2424 S. E. Bristol Street Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( IN THE AMOUNT OF 3450.22 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0965 $25.00; 170526-0965-CK Reference Number 3638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 11/04/16; JUDGMENT FOR: BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ABDULLAH THOMPSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,125.22 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $300.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,425.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ABDULLAH THOMPSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC AS TO ABDULLAH THOMPSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585/ SANCTIONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD J MURPHEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:07; COUNSEL EXPLAINS HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 09/29/16. COURT ACCEPTS EXPLAINATION. NO; SANCTIONS IMPOSED.; PLAINTIFF TO FILE 585 PACKET TODAY.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 02/01/17 CONFIRMED.; 09:09; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:50; THE MATTER IS SET FOR HEARING RE: WHY $75 SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE I MPOSED FOR FAILURE TO; APPEAR.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF 585/ SANCTIONS SET FOR 10/28/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; 08:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ABDULLAH THOMPSON SERVED ON 08/07/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC FOR SANCTIONS; Minutes; Receipt: 160914-0343 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT TAKES NOTE THAT THIS IS THE 6 MONTH REVIEW FOR THIS MATTER PER CCP 3.740.; COURT FURTHER NOTES PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO FILE A DECLARATION REGARDING; SERVICE.; COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO FILE A DECLARATION 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING REGARDING STATUS OF; SERVICE AND WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR TODAYS FAILURE TO APPEAR.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SERVICE/DISMISSAL/SANCTIONS(PLA FTA 080116/FTS) SET FOR 08/31/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.; COURT MAKES ANNOUNCEMENT REGARDING MOVING OF S35S COURTROOM AND CALENDAR TO S17 AT THE SAN; BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER.; 09:08; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF RICHARD J MURPHEY RE CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2870 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF BROOKWOOD LOANS OFCALIFORNIA,LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less