This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 17:03:43 (UTC).

BROGUIERE -V- AIELLO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 BROGUIERE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AIELLO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tomberlin, John M, Ochoa, Gilbert, Poncin, Lynn, Pacheco, John M and McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2084

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Tomberlin, John M

Ochoa, Gilbert

Poncin, Lynn

Pacheco, John M

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL EDWARD BROGUIERE

BROGUIERE, DANIEL EDWARD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ENDEAVOR MORTGAGE GROUP, INC

STEPHANIE MENDOZA

VACATION FUN, LLC

CALIFORNIA SUNSET ESCROW, INC.

ROBERT AIELLO

SUNNY DAYS, LLC

HOMEPATH LENDING, INC.

TOM SAWYER ISLAND II, LLC

CIVIL REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS II,LLC

EL REFUGIO, LLC

SHOWFX, INC.

RICK MARTIN

DAVID MENDOZA

SHOWFX

EL REFUGIO, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VACATION FUN, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ENDEAVOR MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.

TOM SAWYER ISLANDII, LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HOMEPATH LENDING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JULIE D. WEINER, ESQ

20955 Pathfinder Road Sute 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Weiner, Julia D

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OFKEVIN S LACEY

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OFKEVIN S LACEY

206 N Jackson Street Suite 201

Glendale, CA 91206

NORDHOFF, STEVEN G

2700 Newport Blvd Suite 168

Newport Beach, CA 92663

JOHNSON AND ASSOCIATES

100 Bayview Circle Suite 220

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN S. LACEY

206 North Jackson St, Ste 201

Glendale, CA 91206

OVANDO BOWEN LLP

Attorney at OVANDO BOWEN LLP

2808 Drake Ave.

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN S. LACEY

206 North Jackson St, Ste 201

Glendale, CA 91206

NORDHOFF BENGFORT

2700 Newport Blvd Suite 168

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Other Attorneys

Lacey, Kevin Shane

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling Filed

06/24/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/23/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service Filed

06/15/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Proof of Service Filed

06/15/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

06/15/2021: Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

Declaration in Support of Motion re:

06/07/2021: Declaration in Support of Motion re:

Motion re:

06/07/2021: Motion re:

Objection Filed

05/20/2021: Objection Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

05/13/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

05/13/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

05/13/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

05/13/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

05/13/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

04/29/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Declaration re:

04/27/2021: Declaration re:

Motion for Relief from Dismissal

04/27/2021: Motion for Relief from Dismissal

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

03/01/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

03/01/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

269 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL UNDER 473 FIELD BY PLA BROGUIERE ON 06/07/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialMENDOZA, STEPHANIE; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-38375; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE; $7.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialMENDOZA, STEPHANIE; Transaction Assessment; $7.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $7.27 CC paid on 06/28/21 for fax,copies, mailing/postage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: Re: Motion for relief from default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for Relief from Dismissal Due to Untimely Filing, Request for Leave to File Amended Pleadings Under 473; Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Broguiere 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialEL REFUGIO, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-36321; EL REFUGIO, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialEL REFUGIO, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialBROGUIERE, DANIEL EDWARD; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-36085; BROGUIERE, DANIEL EDWARD; $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialBROGUIERE, DANIEL EDWARD; Transaction Assessment; $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
573 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • FinancialEL REFUGIO, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment: $29.00; Total Payments and Credits: $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • FinancialBROGUIERE, DANIEL EDWARD; Total Financial Assessment: $268.77; Total Payments and Credits: $268.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF DANIEL EDWARD BROGUIERE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY DANIEL EDWARD BROGUIERE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 171108-0854-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 171108-0854-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHOWFX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACEY KEVIN S. ESQ.