This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:45:17 (UTC).

BROCK-V-VOORHEES

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 BROCK-V-VOORHEES was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1594

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

E. LAWRENCE BROCK

BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC

LAUREN MARTIN

BROCK LAW OFFICE

BRISTOL AND HAYNES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KARIANN VOORHEES

LAUREN MARTIN

VOORHEES LAW GROUP, AN ENTITY OF UNKOWN

VOORHEES & RATZLAFF LAW GROUP,LLC

MICHAEL V. MANCINI

HOLLY RATZLAFF

ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KARIANN VOORHEES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON-LEGAL

27890 Clinton Keith Rd. Suite D457

Murrieta, CA 92562

Defendant Attorneys

THE BISOL FIRM, APC

19800 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

NEMECEK & COLE

16255 Ventura Blvd Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE FILED BY DEFENDANTS

OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE FILED BY DEFENDANTS

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/04/18 FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/04/18 FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/11/18 FILED BY E. LAWRENCE BROCK. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/11/18 FILED BY E. LAWRENCE BROCK. (IMAGED)

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESTRICTING DISCOVERY FILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESTRICTING DISCOVERY FILED.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA.

ORDER RE:RFA RE:SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REMOVE PLA E LAWRENCE BROCK FILED

ORDER RE:RFA RE:SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REMOVE PLA E LAWRENCE BROCK FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET E. LAWRENCE BROCK WITH PREJUDICE.

ORDER RE: RFA TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED

ORDER RE: RFA TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLA 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/21/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF E. LAWRENCE BROCK, BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC, LAUREN MARTIN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLA 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/21/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF E. LAWRENCE BROCK, BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC, LAUREN MARTIN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/21/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/21/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE BY MAIL ON 05/12/17 AS TO NEMECEK & COLE; THE VOORHEES LAW GROUP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE BY MAIL ON 05/12/17 AS TO NEMECEK & COLE; THE VOORHEES LAW GROUP, FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE VOORHEES & RAYZLAFF LAW GROUP FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE VOORHEES & RAYZLAFF LAW GROUP FILED.

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17 FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17 FILED BY MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY NTC OF ACKWLDGMNT OF RECT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY NTC OF ACKWLDGMNT OF RECT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FILED AS TO MICHAEL V. MANCINI. PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY NTC & ACKNLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FILED AS TO MICHAEL V. MANCINI. PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY NTC & ACKNLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ORDER AFTER HEAREING GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED

ORDER AFTER HEAREING GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION & PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ERRATA; MOT TO COMPEL;SEPARATE STATEMENT BY PERSONAL ON 08/21/18 AS TO KARIANN VOORHEES, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC FOR 2 MOTIONS; Minutes; Receipt: 180803-0970 $150.00; 180803-0970-CK Reference Number 124432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/22/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION & PRODUCTION OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 10/22/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY E. LAWRENCE BROCK, BROCK MARTIN & VOORHEES APC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 161220-0487 $435.00; 161220-0487-VS Reference Number 026-0001951313

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PARTY MICHAEL V. MANCINI UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PARTY MICHAEL V. MANCINI UPDATED: DEFENDANTS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/20/2016 OF E. LAWRENCE BROCK, LAUREN MARTIN, VOORHEES LAW GROUP,AN ENTITY OF UNKOWN, MICHAEL V. MANCINI, ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN, LLP,A CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less