This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 10:22:44 (UTC).

BROBST V MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 BROBST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3191

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORIA BROBST

Defendant

CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0475 $255.00; 161230-0475-CK Reference Number 1163777

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF VICTORIA BROBST ORDERED ENTERED 01/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORIA BROBST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170118-0398 $25.00; 170118-0398-CK Reference Number 1164330

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTORIA BROBST.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTORIA BROBST.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

ORDER DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL LEASE AND ORDER TO EN TER JUDGMENT WITH A COPY OF THE LEASE FILED

ORDER DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL LEASE AND ORDER TO EN TER JUDGMENT WITH A COPY OF THE LEASE FILED

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF VICTORIA BROBST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORIA BROBST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $800.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $519.84.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,074.84; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF VICTORIA BROBST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORIA BROBST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $800.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $519.84.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,074.84; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL LEASE AND ORDER TO EN TER JUDGMENT WITH A COPY OF THE LEASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $355.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 01/24/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTORIA BROBST.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF VICTORIA BROBST, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CORINTHIAN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • 2/21/17 8:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • 2/21/17 8:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $21.66.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0475 $255.00; 161230-0475-CK Reference Number 1163777

    Read MoreRead Less