This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:38:40 (UTC).

BRIGHTON VS BANATLAO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 BRIGHTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BANATLAO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8353

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO

GARI V. BERNABE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0640 $50.00; 171031-0640-CK Reference Number 933096

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GARI V. BERNABE. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $27.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GARI V. BERNABE. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $27.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS REPRESENTED BY DEBRA SCOTTI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEBRA SCOTTI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE.; JUDGMENT FOR: BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,123.64 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $136.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,259.64; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS REPRESENTED BY DEBRA SCOTTI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEBRA SCOTTI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE.; JUDGMENT FOR: BRIGHTON II AT TERRA VISTA HOMEOWNERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO, GARI V. BERNABE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,123.64 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $136.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,259.64; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARJO SOPHIA BANATLAO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GARI V. BERNABE. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVED. WITH FEES OF $27.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0640 $50.00; 171031-0640-CK Reference Number 933096

    Read MoreRead Less