This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 11:57:18 (UTC).

BRIDGEFUND VS GUIDO

Case Summary

On 08/20/2010 BRIDGEFUND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUIDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0824

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP.

Defendant

PATRICIA GUIDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: COPY OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT RECEIVED BACK FROM PATRICIA GUIDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED.; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: TONI DAVIS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP., PATRICIA GUIDO; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT RECEIVES REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF TO CANCEL JUDGMENT.; DEFENDANT HAS PAID OFF ACCOUNT. COURT GRANTS REQUEST TO CANCEL/VACATE JUDGMENT; AND DISMISS MATTER.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/20/2010 OF BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP..; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/20/2010 OF BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP. AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; ON PLAINTIFFS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT PATRICIA GUIDO WITH PREJUDICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP.. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/22/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP. FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP. REPRESENTED BY PARAG MEHTA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PATRICIA GUIDO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; PATRICIA GUIDO NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 10:47; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PARAG MEHTA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST PATRICIA GUIDO.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT 000100 HAVE &; RECOVER FROM 000100.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $315.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $140.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $455.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO PATRICIA GUIDO. PARTY SERVED ON 08/30/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BRIDGEFUND CAPITALCORP. FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100820-1331 $100.00; 100820-1331-CK Reference Number 45714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.