This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:39:14 (UTC).

BRIANDA VALENCIA -N- QUETZALCOHALT FARIAS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 BRIANDA VALENCIA -N- QUETZALCOHALT FARIAS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1000

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRIANDA VALENCIA

Respondent

QUETZALCOHAL T FARIAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 11/30/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF BRIANDA VALENCIA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF BRIANDA VALENCIA ORDERED ENTERED 08/11/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • VACATE RSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • VACATE HFAIL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/22 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON QUETZALCOHAL T FARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BRIANDA VALENCIA FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST QUETZALCOHAL T FARIAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF BRIANDA VALENCIA AS TO QUETZALCOHAL T FARIAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY BRIANDA VALENCIA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BRIANDA VALENCIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BRIANDA VALENCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.