This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/09/2018 at 00:45:21 (UTC).

BRIAN HANNEMANN -V- LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT

Case Summary

On 11/28/2011 BRIAN HANNEMANN filed an Other lawsuit against LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0274

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN G HANNEMANN

Defendants

AURORA LIFE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER,P.C.

THOMAS GARLOCK M.D

SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM

LANDMARK IMAGING MEDICAL GROUP

ARTHUR KREITENBERG MD

LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT

CARL J MELVILLE DC

NEW LIFE CHIROPRACTIC

LLOYD STENBECK M.D

MELVIN F WHITE D.C

DUGGAN CHIROPRACTIC

H. LEON BROOKS M.D

WILSHIRE OPEN MRI

CARL J MELVILLE D.C

TEMECULA VALLEY EMERGENCY MED.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNEMANN LAW FIRM

1042 N Mountain Ave Suite B-222

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARY A. BEMIS

6101 Ball Rd Ste 207A

Cypress, CA 90630

THOMPSON STEINBERG

414 West Grand Blvd #6611

Corona, CA 92878

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • RETURN MAIL: 11/9/15 MIN ORD TO LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT RECEIVED BACK FROM USPO-RTS ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN ORDERED ENTERED 12/01/15; IT IS ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT CARL J. MELVILLE RECOVER $7,222.60. DEFENDANT DUGGAN; CHIROPRACTIC RECOVER $7,222.60. DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT RECOVER $3,000.00. PLAINTIFF HANNEMANN; LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION RECOVER $5,000.00. EACH PARTY BEAR OWN COSTS AND FEES.; SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER KELLY FARRELL 8081; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN HANNEMANN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MATTHEW THOMPSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT, DUGGAN CHROPRACTIC.; ATTORNEY RANDALL BAKER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT, CARL MELVILLE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 1ST DAY OF TRIAL; 11:05; COURT CONVENES WITH ALL COUNSEL PRESENT; COURT MAKES COUNSEL AWARE OF E-MAILS RECEIVED BY DR. AS IT RELATES TO MRS. LIGHTFOOTS CONDITION.; PLAINTFF COUNSEL REQUESTS THE COURT IMPOSE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT MRS, LIGHTFOOT FOR; NOT COMPLYING WITH COURTS PRIOR ORDERS. COUNSEL FURTHER REQUESTS DEFENDANTS ANSWER BE STRIKEN; AND DEFAULT BE ENTERED.; AFTER CONSIDERATION AND AGREEMENT OF ALL COUNSEL PRESENT, THE COURT FINDS NO REASONABLE OR VIABLE; ALTERNATIVE AND ORDERS DEFENDANTS ANSWER STRIKEN AND DEFAULT BE ENTERED. COURT NOTES MANY THE; TIMES DEFENDANT WAS ENCOURAGED TO SEEK LEGAL COUNSEL, AND THE MANY TIMES THIS MATTER WAS; CONTINUED AT DEFENDANTS REQUEST. COURT FURTHER NOTES DEFENDANT, LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT HAS NOT; COMPLIED WITH PREVIOUS COURT ORDERS, INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT AS EX-PARTE COMMUNICATION; HAS BEEN FOUND DEFICIENT AS IT RELATES TO THE INABILITY TO PARTICIPATE IN TRIAL, AND DEFENDANT; HAS MADE NO ATTEMPT TO CONTACT THE COURT REGARDING HER NON APPEARANCE AT TODAYS HEARING.; SET ASIDE ANSWER ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN FOR DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT; COUNSEL STIPULATE TO PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; 11:26; OFF THE RECORD; COURT IN RECESS.; 11:54; COURT RECONVENES WITH ALL COUNSEL PRESENT; COUNSEL INFORM THE COURT SETTLEMENT WAS REACHED.; COURT GRANTS PLAINTIFF COUNSELS MOTION TO AMEND LAW FIRM NAME FROM HANNEMANN LAW FIRM TO; HANNEMANN LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION.; SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS RECITED ON THE RECORD.; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT..; AT PLAINTIFF COUNSELS REQUEST ALL UNAMED AND UNSERVED DEFENDANT ARE ORDERED DISMISSED.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT, IF; JUDGMENT IS SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THIS MATTER WILL BE; TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT.; LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; ANSWER OF LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT HAVING BEEN ORDERED STRICKEN,THE COURT ORDERS DEFAULT ENTERED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 01/14/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR PLAITNIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL READINESS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN HANNEMANN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MATTHEW THOMPSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT, DUGGAN CHIROPRACTIC.; DEFENDANT, LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT NOT PRESENT; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, CARL MELVILLE NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT NOTES DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT IS NOT PRESENT AND LETTER FROM DOCTOR HAS NOT BEEN; FILED WITH THE COURT. COUNSEL INDICATE ALL PARTIES ARE READY TO BEGIN TRIAL.; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 DAYS; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR COURT TRIAL AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN IS SET FOR 12/01/15 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE VIA TELEPHONE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • HEARING RE: LETTER BY DR. LLOYD STENBECK; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT RECEIVED AND APPRECIATES THE LETTER BY DR. LLOYD STENBECK OF 11/8/15 REGARDING MISS; LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT. HOWEVER, THE LETTER MAKES CLEAR THAT MISS LIGHTFOOT WAS SEEN AT KAISER FOR; HER MOST RECENT HEALTH ISSUES. THEREFORE, THE COURT REQUIRES MS. LIGHTFOOT TO OBTAIN A NOTE OR; LETTER FROM THE DOCTOR(S) AT KAISER WHO TREATED MISS LIGHTFOOT MOST RECENTLY. SPECIFICALLY, THE; COURT WANTS THE DOCTOR TO ADVISE AS TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) WILL MISS LIGHTFOOT BE PHYSICALLY; ABLE TO ATTEND AND PARTICIPATE IN TRIAL COMMENCING DECEMBER 1, 2015. (2) IF NOT, WHEN; WILL SHE BE ABLE TO SO ATTEND AND PARTICIPATE IN TRIAL, SO THE COURT CAN SET A MEANINGFUL TRIAL; DATE.; ATTACHED IS THE LETTER FROM DR. LLOYD STENBECK DATED 11/8/15.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 11/9/15 MINUTE ORDER RE: LETTER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN G HANNEMANN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MATTHEW THOMPSON PRESENT FOR DUGGAN CHIROPRACTIC.; ATTORNEY RANDALL BAKER PRESENT FOR CARL J MELVILLE DC.; DEFENDANT CARL J MELVILLE DC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES A PHONE CALL WAS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ATTENDANT ON 11/6/15 FROM A MARK HOFFMANN; REPRESENTING HE WAS RETAINED BY LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT ONLY FOR LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION; AND WOULD NOT BE APPEARING FOR TODAYS TRIAL.; THE COURT FURTHER NOTES, A CALL WAS RECEIVED BY ERIC SCHROEDER ON BEHALF OF LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT; REPRESENTING MISS LIGHTFOOT WOULD NOT BE APPEARING FOR TODAYS TRIAL DUE TO BEING IN THE; EMERGENCY ROOM EARLY THIS MORNING.; DESPITE OBJECTIONS FROM COUNSEL, THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER AND SPECIALLY SETS A; FURTHER TRIAL READINESS AND BENCH TRIAL DATE.; THE COURT ORDERS LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT TO PROVIDE A WRITTEN MEDICAL JUSTIFICATION FROM HER; HEALTHCARE PROVIDER AS TO WHY SHE WOULD NOT BE ABLE TO BEGIN TRIAL ON THE CONTINUED DATE.; THE WRITTEN MEDICAL JUSTIFICATION IS TO BE PROVIDED TO COUNSEL AND THE COURT NO LATER THAN; THE CLOSE OF 11/19/15.; IF LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT FAILS TO APPEAR FOR TRIAL AND FAILS TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A; SATISFACTORY WRITTEN MEDICAL JUSTIFICATION BY THE DATE NOTED ABOVE, THEN THE COURT MAY DEEM; THAT AS A FAILURE TO APPEAR. THE COURT MAY STRIKE MISS LIGHTFOOTS ANSWER AND ENTER DEFAULT; OR PROCEED WITH TRIAL IN HER ABSENCE.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL READINESS SET FOR 11/30/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; FOR TRIAL BEGINNING 12/01/15.; AT 10:00 A.M. IN S25.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY BRIAN G HANNEMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY 6243; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN G. HANNEMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY MATTHEW M. THOMPSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; ATTORNEY RNADALL A. BAKER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; APPEARANCES:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY FOR TRIAL.; WITH THE EXCEPTION OF DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT.; MS. LIGHTFOOT REPRESENTS THAT SHE HAS RECENTLY RETAINED COUNSEL AND REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE TO; MEET AND CONFER WITH RETAINED COUNSEL REGARDING READINESS FOR TRIAL.; ARGUMENT IS PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF AND CO-DEFENDANTS COUNSEL.; AFTER ARGUMENT,; THE COURT INFORMS MS. LIGHTFOOT THAT BASED ON THE AGE OF THE CASE AND AMOUNT OF TIMES MATTER HAS; BEEN CONTINUED PRIOR, ITS INCLINATION WOULD BE TO PROCEED WITH TRIAL.; DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE IS DENIED.; MS. LIGHTFOOT IS TO INFORM RETAINED COUNSEL THAT TRIAL IS TO COMMENCE ON MONDAY. COUNSEL IS TO BE; PRESENT; READY FOR TRIAL OR PREPARED TO PRESENT ARGUMENT FOR FURTHER CONTINUANCE.; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; JURY WAIVED; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 3 DAY(S).; 10:00; SUBSEQUENTLY, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CARL J MELVILLE DC IS PRESENT. COURT ATTENDANT INFORMS; COUNSEL OF TRIAL DATE.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN IS SET FOR 11/09/15 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S25A; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARINGS FILED BY CARL J MELVILLE DC.

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2012
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER LAURA SANDERS 12273; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT LIBERTY LIGHTFOOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SANCTIONS IMPOSED.; HEARING DATE OF 04/27/12 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN, LANDMARK IMAGING MEDICAL GROUP, H. LEON BROOKS M.D, ARTHUR KREITENBERG MD IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 111128-3657 $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/28/2011 OF BRIAN HANNEMANN, AURORA LIFE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER,P.C., THOMAS GARLOCK M.D, LLOYD STENBECK M.D, TEMECULA VALLEY EMERGENCY MED., SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, WILSHIRE OPEN MRI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.