This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:17:46 (UTC).

BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS -N- JOSE DE LA ROSA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 BRENDA L CASTELLANOS -N- JOSE DE LA ROSA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8647

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS

Respondent

JOSE DE LA ROSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/02/18 AS TO JOSE DE LA ROSA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 180426-0142 $4.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS RE: CC/CV (10/04/17); Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; KHYMBERLI S APALOO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM HARMON; COURT REPORTER SICILY ORSTEAD 13523; BAILIFF: J SWAVELY; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; 10:00; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: CC/CV (100417) IS GRANTED; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; SOLE PHYSICAL AND LEGAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN SHALL BE AWARDED TO BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS.; FATHER/JOSE DE LA ROSA TO HAVE VISITATION AS FOLLOWS:; AS MUTUALLY AGREEABLE BETWEEN PARTIES; NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.; THE COURT HAS CONSIDERED THE FACTORS SET FORTH IN FAMILY CODE 3048(B)(1) AND FINDS THAT THERE IS NOT A RISK OF ABDUCTION OF THE CHILD BY EITHER PARTY.; A VIOLATION OF THIS CUSTODY ORDER MAY SUBJECT A PARTY FOUND IN VIOLATION TO CIVIL OR CRIMINAL PENALTIES, OR BOTH.; PETITIONER TO PREPARE SERVE/FILE ORDER AFTER HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON JOSE DE LA ROSA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/18/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • ORDER FILED GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 02/28/18 IS CONTINUED TO 04/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS RE: CC/CV (10/04/17); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KHYMBERLI S APALOO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM HARMON; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; BAILIFF: J SWAVELY; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; 10:35; WITNESS -- PETITIONER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT/PARTIES.; REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ALL DOCUMENTS REQUIRED; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S47.; **FINAL CONTINUANCE**; MOVING PARTY TO PREPARE SERVE/FILE FL307.; BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • VACATE RFOF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S47.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS RE: CC/CV (10/04/17); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 01/16/18 IS CONTINUED TO 02/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS RE: CC/CV (10/04/17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE, RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BRENDA L. CASTELLANOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less