This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 10:55:28 (UTC).

BOUZANE VS. BOUCHE et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 BOUZANE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOUCHE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilleece, Michelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3024

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Gilleece, Michelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNBOUZANE A FAST EVICTION

Defendants

ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

JEAN JACQUES BOUCHE

MICHELLE HARDING HOLLIE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED) 180507-0

04/27/2018: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED) 180507-0

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Gov Code 68152-68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Gilleece, Michelle; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: AT PLTF REQIESST.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketPursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Gilleece, Michelle; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING MICHELLE GILLEECE,JUDGE CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LAW OFFICE OF JOHNBOUZANE A FAST EVICTION, JEAN JACQUES BOUCHE, MICHELLE HARDING HOLLIE, ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: AT PLTF REQIESST. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Original Type: Small Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gilleece, Michelle; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180507-0721; ConversionPayment; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketUpdate Default Department to:; Comment: UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) (imaged); Comment: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED) 180507-0721-CK SMD/ 100.00 PAYMT 180507-0721-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1190248

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant