This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/05/2018 at 21:05:26 (UTC).

BOUQUET ESTATES V. DICKINSON

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 BOUQUET ESTATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DICKINSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1045

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOUQUET ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

KEVIN DICKINSON

SONIA DICKINSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/18/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BOUQUET ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEVEN A MAPES, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; BOUQUET ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION REPRESENTED BY TAMARA VALENCIA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KEVIN DICKINSON, SONIA DICKINSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KEVIN DICKINSON, SONIA DICKINSON NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; TAMARA VALENCIA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KEVIN DICKINSON, SONIA DICKINSON.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT BOUQUET ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION HAVE &; RECOVER FROM KEVIN DICKINSON, SONIA DICKINSON:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,331.13 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $300.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,631.13; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • LETTER FROM THE DEFENDANT PLACED IN FILE FOR CASE SMCRS1101043 DUE TO WRONG CASE #.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KEVIN DICKINSON. PARTY SERVED ON 06/22/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SONIA DICKINSON. PARTY SERVED ON 06/22/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • LETTER FROM THE DEFENDANT PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • LETTER FROM DEFENDANT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110504-1667 $50.00; 110504-1667-CK Reference Number 3250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less