This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:31:58 (UTC).

BOUDREAUX-V-MONG

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 BOUDREAUX-V-MONG was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2420

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDDIE BOUDREAUX

Defendants

SALL NGUYEN

THAI MONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESSEM & NEWSTAT LLP

4515 Sherman Oaks Ave

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/07/17 AT 8:30 IN S25 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/07/17 AT 8:30 IN S22 IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S22 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SALL NGUYEN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ATTACHMENT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS & CMPL FILED AS TO THAI MONG. PARTY SERVED ON 03/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THAI MONG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDDIE BOUDREAUX FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170209-0389 $435.00; 170209-0389-CK Reference Number 1262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.