This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:34:01 (UTC).

BORTON PETRINI -V- A2B AUTO TRANSPORTERS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BORTON PETRINI -V- A2B AUTO TRANSPORTERS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8144

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORTON PETRINI, LLP

201 Needham St

Modesto, CA 95354

Defendants

A2B AUTO TRANSPORTERS, INC.

WILLIAM SWEISS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORTON PETRINI LLP

201 Needham St

Modesto, CA 95354

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO WILLIAM SWEISS ON 101217 WITH FEES OF 64.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO A2B AUTO TRANSPORTERS, INC. WITH COSTS OF $64.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILLIAM SWEISS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $64.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO A2B AUTO TRANSPORTERS, INC. WITH COSTS OF $64.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BORTON PETRINI, LLP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BORTON PETRINI, LLP FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0241 $380.00; 170918-0241-CK Reference Number 395774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less