This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 22:26:05 (UTC).

BONNER-V-ROPER

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 BONNER-V-ROPER was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1137

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APRIL C BONNER

Defendants

BRITTANY ROPER

JENNIFER ROPER

SAM PIZZO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER ROPER, BRITTANY ROPER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER ROPER, BRITTANY ROPER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SAM PIZZO SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SAM PIZZO SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JENNIFER ROPER SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JENNIFER ROPER SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO BRITTANY ROPER SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO BRITTANY ROPER SERVED ON 05/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/25/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/25/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 05/26/17 AS TO H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 05/26/17 AS TO H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SAM PIZZO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY SAM PIZZO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0757 $240.00; 170526-0757-VS Reference Number 026-0046107104

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170523-0170 $255.00; 170523-0170-CK Reference Number 1173076

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 06/23/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170627-0659 $25.00; 170627-0659-CK Reference Number 1173695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; 04:01; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LUKE SINKINSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF APRIL C BONNER PRESENT; DEFENDANT SAM PIZZO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JENNIFER ROPER, BRITTANY ROPER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; WITNESS -- APRIL BONNER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- SAM PIZZO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; TENANCY IS AN AT WILL TENANCY; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/23/2017 OF APRIL BONNER ORDERED ENTERED 06/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: APRIL C BONNER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JENNIFER ROPER, BRITTANY ROPER, SAM PIZZO; PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO MEET BURDEN OF PROOF AS TO MONEY DAMAGES.; ***POSSESSION ONLY***; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JENNIFER ROPER, BRITTANY ROPER, SAM PIZZO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SAM PIZZO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SAM PIZZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 05/26/17 AS TO H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • ** VOID ** LIMITED CIVIL RESPONSE FEE <10,000 SB8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SAM PIZZO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0757 $240.00; 170526-0757-VS Reference Number 026-0046107104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 05/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170523-0170 $255.00; 170523-0170-CK Reference Number 1173076

    Read MoreRead Less