This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:06:45 (UTC).

BONAGUIDI-V-DEROUEN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 BONAGUIDI-V-DEROUEN was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1379

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL BONAGUIDI, JR

Defendants

KEVIN DEROUEN

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBERS & NORONHA

2070 North Tustin Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorneys

RAFFALOW, BRETOI &ADAMS

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TSC FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEVIN DEROUEN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEVIN DEROUEN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0188 $435.00; 171030-0188-CK Reference Number 64122

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

ANSWER FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, BRETOI &ADAMS.

ANSWER FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, BRETOI &ADAMS.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 001 TO BE ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 001 TO BE ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/29/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/29/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GARRETT R CHAMBERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MICHAEL BONAGUIDI, JR.; ATTORNEY CATHERINE M SPARKS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT KEVIN DEROUEN.; ATTORNEY VALERIE D MORRIS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; CASE REFERRED TO COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 12/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 02/28/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY ALL PARTIES.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A; WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR ADVANCE JURY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180606-0785 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES & DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DEFENDANT ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180523-0686 $435.00; 180523-0686-CK Reference Number CK 928010969

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR KEVIN DEROUEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 180508-0502 $150.00; 180508-0502-CK Reference Number #7220005170

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KEVIN DEROUEN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171218-0683 $435.00; 171218-0683-CK Reference Number #02230399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY KEVIN DEROUEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, BRETOI &ADAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEVIN DEROUEN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MICHAEL BONAGUIDI, JR FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0188 $435.00; 171030-0188-CK Reference Number 64122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less