This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:48:08 (UTC).

BOGGS-V-AN ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2011 BOGGS-V-AN was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0424

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN BOGGS

Defendants

JENNIFER SUH AN

MIN KYU AN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER & MONK, LLP

24910 Las Brisas Road Suite 110

Murrieta, CA 92562

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT WAS ALREADY ENTERED ON CASE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PUT IN RUNNER BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 110816-0876 $25.00; 110816-0876-CK Reference Number 153646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110816-0800 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110816-0797 $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/29/2011 OF JOHN BOGGS ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN BOGGS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIN KYU AN, JENNIFER SUH AN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MIN KYU AN, JENNIFER SUH AN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MIN KYU AN, JENNIFER SUH AN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/29/2011 OF JOHN BOGGS AS TO MIN KYU AN, JENNIFER SUH AN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/29/2011 OF JOHN BOGGS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/31/11 WITH FEES OF $36.68.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MIN KYU AN SERVED ON 07/31/11 WITH COSTS OF $96.68 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JENNIFER SUH AN SERVED ON 07/31/11 WITH COSTS OF $36.68 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/CLERKS JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOT SIGNED & MISSING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLIANT ON DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110729-0883 $255.00; 110729-0883-CK Reference Number 153110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less