This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:18:07 (UTC).

BODNEY -V- DURESO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 BODNEY -V- DURESO was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1438

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINIQUE BODNEY

Defendants

JARRETT DURESO

SHURNAE STEWART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. PERLSTEIN

5900 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

WADE & LOWE

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 270

Irvine, CA 92618

THARPE & HOWELL

15250 Ventura Blvd 9Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DOMINIQUE BODNEY

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DOMINIQUE BODNEY

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; ATTORNEY JEFFREY JACOBS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:30; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS RECITED TO COUNSEL; PER LOCAL RULE 411.2, AT THE TRC, ALL TRIAL COUNSEL AND PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR AND; ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE, OPPOSITIONS MUST BE SUBMITTED IN WRITING, ALONG WITH (IF POSSIBLE); JOINT CACI-APPROVED JURY INSTRUCTIONS IN 14-POINT - DOUBLE-SPACED FONT, VERDICT FORMS,; WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST, ALONG WITH A SHORT STATEMENT OF CASE WITH SERVICE OF ABOVE; COMPLETED AT LEAST 8 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/18/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/22/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 3 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE AND TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH A COPY OF THE TRIAL SETTING; ORDERS.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:32; ACTION - COMPLETE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE.

ANSWER FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF DOMINIQUE BODNEY AS TO JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART ADDING ATTORNEY THARPE & HOWELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; ATTORNEY JEFFREY JACOBS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:30; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS RECITED TO COUNSEL; PER LOCAL RULE 411.2, AT THE TRC, ALL TRIAL COUNSEL AND PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR AND; ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE, OPPOSITIONS MUST BE SUBMITTED IN WRITING, ALONG WITH (IF POSSIBLE); JOINT CACI-APPROVED JURY INSTRUCTIONS IN 14-POINT - DOUBLE-SPACED FONT, VERDICT FORMS,; WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST, ALONG WITH A SHORT STATEMENT OF CASE WITH SERVICE OF ABOVE; COMPLETED AT LEAST 8 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/18/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/22/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 3 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE AND TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH A COPY OF THE TRIAL SETTING; ORDERS.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:32; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DOMINIQUE BODNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DEFENDANT JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180215-0946 $760.00; 180215-0946-CK Reference Number 115570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JARRETT DURESO, SHURNAE STEWART.; Minutes; Receipt: 180215-0938 $150.00; 180215-0938-CK Reference Number 115570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DOMINIQUE BODNEY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DOMINIQUE BODNEY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0153 $380.00; 171101-0153-CK Reference Number 2678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less