This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:19:17 (UTC).

BOCANEGRA -V- DIEKER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 BOCANEGRA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIEKER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2093

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEX BOCANEGRA

Defendants

ERIK DIEKER

RHONDA CUNNINGHAM

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2015
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $162.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( $7,125.08 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 130313-0186 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY ALEX BOCANEGRA, FOR ACCRUED INTEREST: $1,063.44/COSTS $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $6,870.38 ); Minutes; Receipt: 121022-2388 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • COST BILL/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $808.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RHONDA CUNNINGHAM IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RHONDA CUNNINGHAM FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY RHONDA CUNNINGHAM; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RHONDA CUNNINGHAM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-3885 $255.00; 110504-3885-CK Reference Number 175760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $41.66.

    Read MoreRead Less