This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 10:51:11 (UTC).

BMT LEASING-V-RODY CASANOVA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 BMT LEASING-V-RODY CASANOVA was filed as an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4538

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMT LEASING, INC

Defendant

RODY PAZ CASANOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROBER & RAPHAEL ALAW CORPORATION

20750 Ventura Blvd Ste 100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS-BANKRUPTCY CASE# 6:11-BK-28922-SC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JDGMENT BY SUB SERVICE ON 06/20/11 AS TO RODY CASANOVA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110506-2831 $395.00; 110506-2831-CK Reference Number 075146

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILED 05/04/2011 OF BMT LEASING, INC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILED 05/04/2011 OF BMT LEASING, INC ORDERED ENTERED 05/04/11; JUDGMENT FOR: BMT LEASING, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RODY PAZ CASANOVA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $39,232.29 INTEREST $1,199.70 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $395.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $40,826.99; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less