Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2018 at 00:53:29 (UTC).

BLANCA PEREZ -V- CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS

Case Summary

On 07/15/2011 BLANCA PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6625

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BLANCA PEREZ

VALERIA VERDUGO

ROSARIO PEREZ

MARIA ZEPEDA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS

Plaintiff and Minor

VALERIA VERDUGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

DAVID H RICKS & ASSOCIATES

8600 Utica Avenue Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CLASEN, RAFFALOW &RHOADS

1000 Lakes Drive Suite 350

West Covina, CA 91790

Cross Defendant Attorneys

DIETZ, ALISEDA & ASSOCIATES

11900 North 26Th St. Ste 200

Edinburg, TX 78539

CRANDALL, WADE & LOWE

7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MEDIATOR ED FERNANDEZ FROM IVJC PRESENT.; CLERK: MARLENE GALINDO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BLANCA PEREZ, MARIA ZEPEDA, ROSARIO PEREZ PRESENT; ATTORNEY MICHELLE WELLS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY GEOFFREY HILL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 08/12/12 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • MEDIATION BRIEF PLACED IN ME BIN FOR HRG 4/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • PLAINTIFFS MEDIATION BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11/17/2011 OF CHRISTOPHER LEWIS AS TO BLANCA PEREZ ADDING ATTORNEY CRANDALL, WADE & LOWE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID H RICKS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MICHELLE L WELLS-GENTILE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COURT ORDERS MATTER TO MEDIATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; HEARINGS:; MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/02/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. ME; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 08/30/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9; FOR TRIAL BEGINNING 09/04/12.; PARTIES TO EXCHANGE TRIAL DOCUMENTS BY 08/16/12.; PARTIES SHALL FILE ALL TRIAL DOCUMENTS WITH THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 08/27/12; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BLANCA PEREZ, MARIA ZEPEDA, ROSARIO PEREZ, VALERIA VERDUGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BLANCA PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2011
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLASEN, RAFFALOW &RHOADS.; Minutes; Receipt: 111117-2621 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/14/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHRISTOPHER ROBIN LEWIS SERVED ON 10/10/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/15/2011 OF BLANCA PEREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR VALERIA VERDUGO IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS BLANCA PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110715-3337 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less