This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:37:47 (UTC).

BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA -N- ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARR

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA -N- ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5803

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA

Respondent

ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA FOR CERTIFIED JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180313-0299 $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF BLANCA TAPIA MORA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF BLANCA TAPIA MORA ORDERED ENTERED 08/30/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARRO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF BLANCA TAPIA MORA AS TO ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARRO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROBERTO LAGUNA NAVARRO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0326 $5.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $11.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BLANCA ESTELA TAPIA MORA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less