This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 14:20:46 (UTC).

BLACKMAN -V- JC MECHANICAL, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 BLACKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JC MECHANICAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH D DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0323

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

KEITH D DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DONNESHA BLACKMAN

KANI ISRAEL

TYRELL WEBB

EMANUEL CARDWELL

ANTHONY CARDWELL

JEREMIAH CARDWELL

Defendants

JC MECHANICAL, INC.

DONALD RIGGLE

JC MECHANICAL , INC

DON RIGGLE

Plaintiffs and Minors

KANI ISRAEL

TYRELL WEBB

EMANUEL CARDWELL

ANTHONY CARDWELL

JEREMIAH CARDWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH D RYAN

3055 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1030

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:; PAGE #2 INDICATES FEE WAIVER PREVIOUSLY GRANTED PLAINTIFF IS RECOVERING $10,000 OR MORE IN VALUE; BY THIS ACTION. ALL COURT FEES AND COURT COSTS THAT WERE WAIVED; IN THIS ACTION HAVE BEEN PAID TO THE COURT WHICH THE FEES HAVE NOT BEEN PAID TO DATE.; PLEASE RE-SUBMIT THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FORM SIGNED BY ATTORNEY (ON PAGE #2) AND RE-SUBMIT; WITH THE FILING FEES OF $380.00 WHICH SHOULD BE PAID AS PER #3 ON PAGE #2 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; FORM CIV-110

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,430.00 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,430.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/22/2015 OF DONNESHA BLACKMAN BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/22/2015 OF DONNESHA BLACKMAN BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF DONNESHA BLACKMAN, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF DONNESHA BLACKMAN, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET DONNESHA BLACKMAN WITH PREJUDICE.

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH D. RYAN RE FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH D. RYAN RE FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN.; Minutes; VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/29/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR JEREMIAH CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR JEREMIAH CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR ANTHONY CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR ANTHONY CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR EMANUEL CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR EMANUEL CARDWELL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR TYRELL WEBB IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR TYRELL WEBB IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KANI ISRAEL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KANI ISRAEL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FURTHER AND FINAL OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 07/12/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER KERRI DAVERSA 13882; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES A VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT WAS FILED WITH THE COURT ON 6/27/16.; OUT OF AN ABUNDANCE OF CAUTION, THE COURT CONTINUES TODAYS HEARING. IF THERE IS NO; APPEARANCE AT THE CONTINUANCE DATE, THE COURT MAY WELL DISMISS THE ENTIRE ACTION.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : FURTHER AND FINAL OSC RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 08/11/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY SPECIAL APPEARANCE ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160712-1054$435.00; 160712-1054-CK Reference Number 4953

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketAction Text: VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:; PAGE #2 INDICATES FEE WAIVER PREVIOUSLY GRANTED PLAINTIFF IS RECOVERING $10,000 OR MORE IN VALUE; BY THIS ACTION. ALL COURT FEES AND COURT COSTS THAT WERE WAIVED; IN THIS ACTION HAVE BEEN PAID TO THE COURT WHICH THE FEES HAVE NOT BEEN PAID TO DATE.; PLEASE RE-SUBMIT THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FORM SIGNED BY ATTORNEY (ON PAGE #2) AND RE-SUBMIT; WITH THE FILING FEES OF $380.00 WHICH SHOULD BE PAID AS PER #3 ON PAGE #2 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; FORM CIV-110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER MICHELLE SWAL 13580; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF DONNESHA BLACKMAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OUT OF AN ABUNDANCE OF CAUTION, THE SPECIALLY APPEARING ATTORNEY REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/12/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketAction Text: PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER MICHELLE SWAL 13580; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PETITIONER.; DONNESHA BLACKMAN (PETITIONER) PRESENT.; JEREMIAH CARDWELL (MINOR) PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT INQUIRES OF PETITIONER.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION TRUE AND THE PETITION IS GRANTED.; THE COURT FINDS THAT SETTLEMENT AMOUNT IS IN THE BEST INTEREST OF MINOR.; THE COURT FINDS THAT SETTLEMENT AMOUNT IS NECESSARY AND IN THE BEST INTEREST OF MINOR.; SETTLEMENT APPROVED IN THE SUM OF $10,500.00; ATTORNEY FEES OF $2,500.00 AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ARE APPROVED.; MEDICAL EXPENSES OF: $570.00 ARE APPROVED; THE BALANCE OF $7,430.00 IS ORDERED DEPOSITED IN A TRUST ACCOUNT WITH THE PETITIONER AS TRUSTEE AT WELLS FARGO BANK WITH NO FUNDS TO BE WITHDRAWN WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING ORDER OF COURT UNTIL THE MINOR ATTAINS THE; AGE OF 18 YEARS.; ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE AND TO DEPOSIT FUNDS ARE SIGNED BY THE COURT.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR ON THE CONTINUANCE DATE IF PROOF OF DEPOSIT/PROOF; OF ANNUITY PURCHASE HAS NOT BEEN FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE.; NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED PROVIDED RETURN IS FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO DATE OF CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT/PROOF OF ANNUITY SET FOR 07/12/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KANI ISRAEL IS DONNESHA BLACKMAN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketAction Text: FILING FEE WAIVED ON DONNESHA BLACKMAN FOR NEW FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DONNESHA BLACKMAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketAction Text: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketAction Text: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.