This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:46:56 (UTC).

BIRNBAUM-V-THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 BIRNBAUM-V-THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1517

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEITH BIRNBAUM

SHAWNA BIRNBAUM

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH

MARIAH BURNS

STEVEN BURNS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MARIAH BURNS

STEVEN BURNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRARDI & KEESE

155 W Hospitality Lane Ste 260

San Bernardino, CA 92408

BENTLEY & MORE, LLP

1710 Plum Lane Ste. A

Redlands, CA 92374

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICE OF MARC JENNINGS

Po Box 80916

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3623

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3623

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ERRATA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 04/17/18 AS TO MARIAH BURNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ERRATA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 04/17/18 AS TO MARIAH BURNS, FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GIRARDI & KEESE WITH BENTLEY & MORE, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KEITH BIRNBAUM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GIRARDI & KEESE WITH BENTLEY & MORE, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KEITH BIRNBAUM.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF KEITH BIRNBAUM BY THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF KEITH BIRNBAUM BY THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM.

ANSWER FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN& CONNERS LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN& CONNERS LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN& CONNERS LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN& CONNERS LLP.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIAH BURNS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/20/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIAH BURNS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/20/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE MARIAH BURNS FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE MARIAH BURNS FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN BURNS SERVED ON 03/21/18 WITH FEES OF $94.75.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN BURNS SERVED ON 03/21/18 WITH FEES OF $94.75.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN BURNS SERVED ON 04/06/18 WITH FEES OF $115.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN BURNS SERVED ON 04/06/18 WITH FEES OF $115.00.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE STEVEN BURNS FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE STEVEN BURNS FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ERRATA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/15/18 AS TO STEVEN BURNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ERRATA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/15/18 AS TO STEVEN BURNS, FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT G TREIHART; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CATHERINE LAGMAN-LEGASPI FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL-JAMES F. TIERNEY III.; ATTORNEY CATHERINE LAGMAN-LEGASPI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH.; ATTORNEY DANIEL A. DEZIEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS NEW TO THE CASE. DEPOSITIONS ARE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR THE HOMESTEAD TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM.; Minutes; Receipt: 190603-0529 $150.00; 190603-0529-CK Reference Number 47018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GIRARDI & KEESE WITH BENTLEY & MORE, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SHAWNA BIRNBAUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GIRARDI & KEESE WITH BENTLEY & MORE, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KEITH BIRNBAUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: MONIQUE DE LA ROSA; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANDRE REKTE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MARC J. JENNINGS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH.; ATTORNEY COLLEEN A. DEZIEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; THE COURT ENCOURAGES ALL PARTIES TO DISCUSS TRIAL CALENDARS AND DATE AS WELL AS PRIVATE MEDIATION,; IF NOT THE COURT WILL SET A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; ALL COUNSEL AMENABLE TO PRIVATE MEDIATION AND A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STEVEN BURNS, MARIAH BURNS.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF KEITH BIRNBAUM BY THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LAW OFFICE OF MARC JENNINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE HOMESTEAD AT WILSHIRE RANCH; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $130.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KEITH BIRNBAUM, SHAWNA BIRNBAUM FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0889 $435.00; 171030-0889-CK Reference Number 16899

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less