This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/03/2018 at 03:55:17 (UTC).

BILLINGS-V-CRIST

Case Summary

On 07/13/2012 BILLINGS-V-CRIST was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0281

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Others

DEBRA BILLINGS

THOMAS CRIST

Appellant, Defendant and Other

THOMAS CRIST

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO THOMAS CRIST WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO THOMAS CRIST WITH COSTS OF $0.00

NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR SENT.

NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR SENT.; Minutes; BY COURTS OWN MOTION, YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SET; FOR/CONTINUED TO 09/29/14 AT 1:30 IN DEPT. M4.; NOTICES PRINTED

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY THOMAS CRIST. (IMAGED); Disposition: DENIED

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY THOMAS CRIST. (IMAGED); Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; Receipt: 140818-2355 $20.00; MOTION TO VACATE DENIED ON 11/17/14.

BENCH WARRANT THOMAS CRIST. (IMAGED)

BENCH WARRANT THOMAS CRIST. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR BY PERSONA ON 07/30/14 AS TO THOMAS CRIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR BY PERSONA ON 07/30/14 AS TO THOMAS CRIST, FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 140306-1205 $60.00

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF OVER THE COUNTER )

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF OVER THE COUNTER ); Minutes; Receipt: 130117-1369 $25.00

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/20/12 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/20/12 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 07/13/2012 OF DEBRA BILLINGS FILED BY THOMAS CRIST.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 07/13/2012 OF DEBRA BILLINGS FILED BY THOMAS CRIST.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF THOMAS CRIST FILED (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF THOMAS CRIST FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO THOMAS CRIST. PARTY SERVED ON 07/17/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO THOMAS CRIST. PARTY SERVED ON 07/17/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THOMAS CRIST (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THOMAS CRIST (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120718-3538 $75.00

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120713-3446 $75.00; 120713-3446-MC Reference Number 025-0044247546

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2014
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: R HAZELL; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DEBRA BILLINGS PRESENT; DEFENDANT THOMAS CRIST PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; MOTION; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- DEBRA BILLINGS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- THOMAS CRIST IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; THOMAS CRIST'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; DEFENDANT WAS PROVIDED THE SC-133 FORM TO FILL OUT AND RETURN TO COURT WITH IT COMPLETED.; COURT RECONVENES WITH BOTH PARTIES PRESENT; SC-133 WAS COMPLETED AND HANDED TO PLAINTIFF IN OPEN COURT.; COURT FINDS THERE IS NO SUFFICIENT EVIDENCE SATISFYING THE JUDGMENT AND DENIES THIS MOTION.; THOMAS CRIST'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: COPY OF DEC RE SATISFACTION OF JMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM THOMAS CRIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; DEFENDANT THOMAS CRIST PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DEBRA BILLINGS; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- THOMAS CRIST IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; DEFENDANT THOMAS CRIST PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DEBRA BILLINGS; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- THOMAS CRIST IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT TO FILE DECLARATION AND APPLICATION TO THE COURT STATING HOW DEBT WAS SATISFIED.; DEFENDANT COULD REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT.; HEARING CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF DEBT SATISFIED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/17/14 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF MOTION RECEIVED BACK FROM THOMAS CRIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF MOTION RECEIVED BACK FROM THOMAS CRIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE TO APPEAR RECEIVED BACK FROM DEBRA BILLINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE TO VACATE RECEIVED BACK FROM DEBRA BILLINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO THOMAS CRIST WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR SENT.; Minutes; BY COURTS OWN MOTION, YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SET; FOR/CONTINUED TO 09/29/14 AT 1:30 IN DEPT. M4.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120726-1793 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF THOMAS CRIST FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO THOMAS CRIST. PARTY SERVED ON 07/17/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120718-3543 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY THOMAS CRIST (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120718-3538 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • VACATE HSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/12 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120713-3446 $75.00; 120713-3446-MC Reference Number 025-0044247546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less