This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 07:12:57 (UTC).

BIJAN BOUTIQUES-V-AKUBIRO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 BIJAN BOUTIQUES-V-AKUBIRO was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0995

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIJAN BOUTIQUES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED

BIJAN BOUTIQUES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ROSAMARI ISONG

RICHARD MILAM AKUBIRO

Isong, Rosamari

AKUBIRO, RICHARD MILAM

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

Milam Akubiro, Richard

Isong, Rosamari

Milam, Richard

an individual

CONV

Not Classified By Court

ISONG, ROSAMARI BARCELON

Milam, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPITZER, DANIEL B

16311 Ventura Blvd Ste 1200

Encino, CA 91436-2152

Spitzer, Daniel Bruce

Defendant Attorney

NELSON COMIS KETTLE & KINNEY LLP

Attorney at NELSON COMIS KETTLE & KINNEY LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

NELSON COMIS KAHN & SEPULVEDA LLP

Attorney at NELSON COMIS KAHN & SEPULVEDA LLP

 

Court Documents

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

04/06/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

04/06/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

04/06/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Order Re: Filed

04/06/2021: Order Re: Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/06/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

03/22/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

02/22/2021: Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

Summons Issued on

12/15/2020: Summons Issued on

Cross-Complaint Filed

12/15/2020: Cross-Complaint Filed

Answer Filed

12/15/2020: Answer Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/24/2020: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

11/24/2020: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

NOTICE IMAGED

09/30/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/30/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

09/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketUnserved; Return Unserved: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialISONG, ROSAMARI; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2020-05096; DDS Legal Support Systems, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialISONG, ROSAMARI; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF BIJAN BOUTIQUES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY BIJAN BOUTIQUES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED FOR FAX FEE 201006-0431-VS FAX/ 56.00 PAYMT 201006-0431-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0038062986

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY BIJAN BOUTIQUES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 201006-0429-VS CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 201006-0429-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0038062749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENT SENT. PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR THIS TYPE OF FILING, AS SOON AS POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant