This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:06:09 (UTC).

BHULLAR-V-TESORO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 BHULLAR-V-TESORO was filed as a Contract - Business lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9400

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARAMBIR BHULLAR

SAHAARA OIL, INC. A CALIFORNIACORPORATION

SAHAARA PROPERTIESLLC, A CALIFORNIA

Defendants

JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY, LLC

MIDLAND OIL GROUP,LLC

Cross Plaintiff

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC

Cross Defendants

SAHAARA OIL INC

SAHAARA PROPERTIESLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

1840 Century Park East, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

PACHECO & NEACH P.C.

1 Park Plaza Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINS & WHITE

2424 S.E. Bristol Street Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

CUMMINS & WHITE LLP

2424 Se Bristol St, Ste 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

BUCHALTER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

55 Second Street Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

PAUL HASTINGS LLP

515 South Flower Street Twenty-Fifth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED NTC OF MTN BY OVERNIGHT SVC ON 11/11/17 AS TO ATTY FOR PLTF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED NTC OF MTN BY OVERNIGHT SVC ON 11/11/17 AS TO ATTY FOR PLTF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED NTC OF MTN BY OVERNIGHT SVC ON 11/11/17 AS TO ATTY FOR PLTF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED NTC OF MTN BY OVERNIGHT SVC ON 11/11/17 AS TO ATTY FOR PLTF, FILED.

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW YODER FILED

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW YODER FILED

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW YODER FILED

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW YODER FILED

NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS FILED BY KARAMBIR BHULLAR.

NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS FILED BY KARAMBIR BHULLAR.

COURT RULING ON TESORO MOTION TO COMPEL HEARD 3/21/18 FILED.

COURT RULING ON TESORO MOTION TO COMPEL HEARD 3/21/18 FILED.

DECLARATION OF BRIAN NEACH ISO OPPO TO MTN FILED

DECLARATION OF BRIAN NEACH ISO OPPO TO MTN FILED

DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA P. GRAYNER FILED

DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA P. GRAYNER FILED

ANSWER FILED BY SAHAARA PROPERTIESLLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PACHECO & NEACH P.C..

ANSWER FILED BY SAHAARA PROPERTIESLLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PACHECO & NEACH P.C..

AMENDED MOTION AND MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKING FILED.

AMENDED MOTION AND MOTION OBJECTING TO UNDERTAKING FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT & MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT & MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PAS AND 5 DECLARATIONS ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTN FOR PRLIM INJ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PAS AND 5 DECLARATIONS ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTN FOR PRLIM INJ FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

DECLARATION OF JUANITA ORTIZ FILED

DECLARATION OF JUANITA ORTIZ FILED

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE * FILED.

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE * FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO BE HEARD ON 10/10/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO BE HEARD ON 10/10/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24X.

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF FOR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS (8/15/18) FILED BY DEFENDANT MIDLAND OIL GROUP,LLC, JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARAMBIR BHULLAR (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DECLARATION OF BILAL A. ESSAYLI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND OIL GROUP,LLC, JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL FOR MOTION FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180815-1049 $90.00; 180815-1049-CK Reference Number 166084

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DECLARATION OF OF EDWARD J FARRELL IN SUPP OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT MIDLAND OIL GROUP,LLC, JATINDERPAL DHALIWAL (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS PACHECO & NEACH P.C. FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING KARAMBIR BHULLAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO QUASH SUBPOENA FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARAMBIR BHULLAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KARAMBIR BHULLAR FOR EX PARTE HEARING; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0580 $90.00; 171005-0580-CK Reference Number 1774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KARAMBIR BHULLAR FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0533 $435.00; 171004-0533-CK Reference Number CK 1772

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • VOLUME # 1 BEGINS ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 10/04/17 AND 10/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less