This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 14:48:35 (UTC).

BH FINANCIAL -V- WEAVER

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 BH FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEAVER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3361

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

WEAVER, SHANNON

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miele, Kenneth John

 

Court Documents

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

08/31/2021: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE A

07/06/2020: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE A

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM L

05/28/2020: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM L

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

08/12/2019: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

07/23/2019: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON REDU

06/21/2019: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON REDU

DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF NON MILITARY STATUS F

06/10/2019: DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF NON MILITARY STATUS F

DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

06/10/2019: DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

06/10/2019: DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

06/10/2019: DECLARATION OF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORIGINAL CREDITOR'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTR

06/10/2019: ORIGINAL CREDITOR'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTR

DECLARATION RE- AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BH

06/10/2019: DECLARATION RE- AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BH

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF BH FINAN

06/10/2019: DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF BH FINAN

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

06/10/2019: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SHANNO

01/03/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SHANNO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

12/20/2018: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

12/20/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

12/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialBH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-51114; BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialBH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 40.00 Filing Fee paid for on 12/10/20 for Writ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs:356.00;Interest:516.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCost Bill After Judgment Filed; Comment: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $356.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $257.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Los Angeles; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190829-0077; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,285.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 181220-0898-CK CDL/ 196.00 PAYMT 181220-0898-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 25901

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed; Comment: DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1)); Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where BH Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIELE KENNETH J. ESQ.