This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 16:33:53 (UTC).

BH FINANCIAL-V-RICHARD MELLOR

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 BH FINANCIAL-V-RICHARD MELLOR was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, David A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8615

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, David A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

MELLOR, RICHARD

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miele, Kenneth John

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption Filed

12/29/2021: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption Filed

Opposition to Claim of Exemption

12/29/2021: Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Notice of Entry of Judgment

08/20/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

12/09/2020: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Writ Returned

09/24/2020: Writ Returned

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

02/13/2020: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF BH FINANI

10/30/2019: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF BH FINANI

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD MELLOR FI

10/30/2019: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD MELLOR FI

DECLARATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

10/30/2019: DECLARATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

10/30/2019: DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST CALCULATION

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

10/30/2019: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION RE- SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT PER CC 1788.50

10/30/2019: DECLARATION RE- SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT PER CC 1788.50

DECLARATION RE- SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT PER CC 1788.58

10/30/2019: DECLARATION RE- SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT PER CC 1788.58

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON RICHAR

07/19/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON RICHAR

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

06/27/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

06/27/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

06/27/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

06/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption; Judicial Officer: Williams, David A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialBH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-00868; PMGI, LLC; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialBH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $60.00 check paid on 01.06.2022 for Claim of Exemption Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption Filed; Comment: filed by Plaintiff BH Financial Group, LLC filed 12.29.2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Claim of Exemption; Comment: filed by BH Financial Group, LLC filed 12.29.2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialBH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-50360; BH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialBH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Orange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $460.00; Total Payments and Credits: $460.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialBH FINANICAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment: $100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF BH FINANICAL GROUPLLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY BH FINANICAL GROUPLLC FOR NEW FILING FEE 190628-0323-CK CVM/ 380.00 PAYMT 190628-0323-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 27627

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Initiated and Party Information Entered; Comment: CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where BH FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIELE KENNETH J. ESQ.