This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:14:26 (UTC).

BEVERLY BATES

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 BEVERLY BATES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0904

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHELLE DAVIS

Decedent

BEVERLY BATES

Not Classified By Court

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS

HRG OF 12/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHELLE DAVIS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, -- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHELLE DAVIS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, -- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PETITION SPECIAL ADMINSTRATION FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS(PROBATE).

PETITION SPECIAL ADMINSTRATION FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS(PROBATE).

PETITION RE: LETTERSOF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERSOF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/12/2017 OF MICHELLE DAVIS, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE IS ADDED AS A BONDING CO..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED MICHELLE DAVIS IN THE AMT OF $125,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHELLE DAVIS FOR CERTIFIED COPIES OF ORDER -2 IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, BEVERLY BATES APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $125,000.00, BM GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; MICHELLE DAVIS PRESENT IN PRO PER.; CLIFF LYNCH PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROBATE NOTES 2 AND 3 CLEARED.; PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/12/2017 OF MICHELLE DAVIS IS GRANTED; MICHELLE DAVIS IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; BOND REQUIRED $125,000.00; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 05/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/12/2017 OF MICHELLE DAVIS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • HRG OF 02/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHELLE DAVIS FOR PETITION AND SPECIAL PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $695.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINITNG ADMIN RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING SPECIAL RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHELLE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less