This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:10:58 (UTC).

BETTY JEAN CLAY CHIRRICK

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 BETTY JEAN CLAY CHIRRICK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0116

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARK CHIRRICK

Decedent

BETTY JEAN CLAY CHIRRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCCLELLAN & WILSON

149 N San Gorgonio Avenue

Banning, CA 92220

 

Court Documents

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK CHIRRICK

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK CHIRRICK

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: ON DISTRIBUTION BY MARK CHIRRICK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: ON DISTRIBUTION BY NICHOLAS E CHIRRICK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: ON DISTRIBUTION BY SHAWN PATTERSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: ON DISTRIBUTION BY CYDNEY USITALO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK CHIRRICK FOR 1-CC ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180410-0693 $26.50; 180410-0693-DB Reference Number 031-0102465631

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • HRG OF 04/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK CHIRRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0321 $465.00; 170207-0321-CK Reference Number 5120

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.