Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/12/2018 at 03:48:00 (UTC).

BERUMEN -V- OLD ENGLISH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2015 BERUMEN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLD ENGLISH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2848

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PATSY BERUMEN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

OLD ENGLISH RANCHO

JUDITH A. JOHNSTON

MARY H. HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNER OF OLD

PETER HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNEROF OLD

JUDITH A JOHNSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL WEILER LAW CORPORATION

980 Montecito Drive Ste 101

Corona, CA 92879

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

3403 Tenth Street Suite 700

Riverside, CA 92501

STREAM KIM HICKS WRAGE & ALFARO, PC

3403 Tenth St Suite 700

Riverside, CA 92501

MITCHELLWEILER LAWCORPORATION

980 Montecito Drive Suite 101

Corona, CA 92879

 

Court Documents

OLD ENGLISH AND JUDITH JOHNSON ONJECTION TO REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

OLD ENGLISH AND JUDITH JOHNSON ONJECTION TO REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

OLD ENGLISH AND JUDITH JOHNSON ONJECTION TO REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

OLD ENGLISH AND JUDITH JOHNSON ONJECTION TO REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

DECLARATION OF J. DANA WEILER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF J. DANA WEILER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF J. DANA WEILER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF J. DANA WEILER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, FOR COSTS OF $101,906.61.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, FOR COSTS OF $101,906.61.

DECLARATION RE: STEFANIE FIELD IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON, PETER HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNEROF OLD, MARY H. HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNER OF OLD

DECLARATION RE: STEFANIE FIELD IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON, PETER HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNEROF OLD, MARY H. HILVERS, GENERAL PARTNER OF OLD

DECLARATION OF JAMIE WALLACE FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMIE WALLACE FILED

EX PARTE TRO, RIGHT TO ATTACH, WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED.

EX PARTE TRO, RIGHT TO ATTACH, WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL BY MAIL ON 03/30/18 AS TO JAMIE E WRAGE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL BY MAIL ON 03/30/18 AS TO JAMIE E WRAGE, FILED.

REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.

PLA BERUMENS OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONFORM TO PROOF FILED.

PLA BERUMENS OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONFORM TO PROOF FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: X-COMPLAINANTS MIL #2 RE EXTRAMARITAL RELATIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/08/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATSY BERUMEN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: X-COMPLAINANTS MIL #2 RE EXTRAMARITAL RELATIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/08/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATSY BERUMEN (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17 FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17 FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF P. BERUMEN RE OPPOSITION TO MTN TO FILE 2ND AMEND X-COMP FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF P. BERUMEN RE OPPOSITION TO MTN TO FILE 2ND AMEND X-COMP FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO JANET M FRANGIE.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO JANET M FRANGIE.

DECLARATION OF OF JUDITH A JOHNSTON AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF OF JUDITH A JOHNSTON AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • $4417.00 REPORTER FEES REIMBURSED TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF OLD ENGLISH RANCHO; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 06/13/18 AS TO JAIME WRAGE, ESQ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY PATSY BERUMEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, FOR COSTS OF $101,906.61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2541350.38 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180612-0913 $25.00; 180612-0913-CK Reference Number 2156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY OLD ENGLISH RANCHO, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180604-0383 $125.00; 180604-0383-CK Reference Number 2126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 3 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 11/16/17 AND 01/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JUDITH A. JOHNSTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JUDITH A. JOHNSTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $120.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OLD ENGLISH RANCHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/10/15 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/08/2015 OF PATSY BERUMEN, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON, JUDITH A. JOHNSTON IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150908-1161 $435.00; 150908-1161-CK Reference Number 5488

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less