This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 03/18/2019 at 22:53:31 (UTC).

BELLIDO -V- PERFECT ATUO

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 BELLIDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERFECT ATUO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5455

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICARDO BELLIDO

Defendant

PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER )

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER )

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:21; JAMES BRUCE MINTON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: PATTY PENMAN; PLAINTIFF RICARDO BELLIDO PRESENT; PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC REPRESENTED BY HANI ABUJEDEH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- RICARDO BELLIDO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; HANI ABUJUDEH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 07/14/2015 OF RICARDO BELLIDO ORDERED ENTERED 08/21/15; JUDGMENT FOR: RICARDO BELLIDO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,500.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DOCUMENT MAY BE PICKED UP AT CLERKS OFFICE.; ; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2016
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICARDO BELLIDO, PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCES; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • VACATE ORAP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC WITH COSTS OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RICARDO BELLIDO FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO BELLIDO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/02/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:21; JAMES BRUCE MINTON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: PATTY PENMAN; PLAINTIFF RICARDO BELLIDO PRESENT; PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC REPRESENTED BY HANI ABUJEDEH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- RICARDO BELLIDO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; HANI ABUJUDEH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 07/14/2015 OF RICARDO BELLIDO ORDERED ENTERED 08/21/15; JUDGMENT FOR: RICARDO BELLIDO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,500.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DOCUMENT MAY BE PICKED UP AT CLERKS OFFICE.; ; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PERFECT AUTO DETAILERS LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RICARDO BELLIDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RICARDO BELLIDO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RICARDO BELLIDO FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.