This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:05:49 (UTC).

BELLE -V- WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BELLE -V- WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7787

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT LEE BELLE

Defendant

WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF LARRY H. PARKER, INC.

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant Attorney

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION.; Minutes; Receipt: 180808-0538 $150.00; 180808-0538-CK Reference Number 130792

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANIEL BROWN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROBERT LEE BELLE.; ATTORNEY FRED BINGHAM PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED WITHIN 30 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A; WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; COUNSEL ARE AMENABLE TO PRIVATED MEDIATION. MEDIATION IS TO BE COMPLETED 30 DAYS PRIOR TO; THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE DATE OF 8/15/19.; REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL HANDED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 08/15/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/19/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/06/18 AT 8:30 IN S33 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/06/18 AT 8:30 IN S24 IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT FINDS THE AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP170.6 FILED BY WRIGHT TRANSPORTATION AS TO JUDGE GILBERT OCHOA TIMELY. CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE DONNA GUNNELL GARZA FOR ALL PURPOSES.; CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S24 FOR ALL PURPOSES.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 08/06/18 CONFIRMED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S24 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: 170.6; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT FINDS THE AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6 FILED AS TO JUDGE GILBERT; OCHOA TIMELY. MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE SUPERVISING JUDGE FOR REASSIGNMENT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO GILBERT OCHOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NTC & ACK OF RECEIPT ARE REQUIRED WHEN MARKING IT AND ORI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT LEE BELLE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0575 $435.00; 170914-0575-CK Reference Number CK 331034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT LEE BELLE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less