This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:17:06 (UTC).

BELANGER -V- CUTLER et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 BELANGER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CUTLER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGER BELANGER

Defendants

CYTHIA L CUTLER

ALAN CUTLER

JAMES LEE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON 3/6/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON 3/6/17)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER ORDERED ENTERED 03/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROGER BELANGER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JAMES LEE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JAMES LEE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALAN CUTLER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALAN CUTLER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CYTHIA L CUTLER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CYTHIA L CUTLER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/10/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/10/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON 3/6/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER ORDERED ENTERED 03/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROGER BELANGER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROGER BELANGER FOR WRIT FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER SUE A DALTON 5124; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF ROGER BELANGER PRESENT; ATTORNEY HARLAN BRANSKY (LIMITED APPEARANCE) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL); ROGER BELANDER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/10/2017 OF ROGER BELANGER ORDERED ENTERED 03/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROGER BELANGER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CYTHIA L CUTLER, JAMES LEE, ALAN CUTLER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $250.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $680.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,130.00; THE RENTAL AGREEMENT IS CANCELLED.; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROGER BELANGER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROGER BELANGER FOR FIRST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • 4/03/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • 4/03/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROGER BELANGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less