This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 11:12:25 (UTC).

BEGA VS ONTARIO LODGING

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 BEGA filed an Other lawsuit against ONTARIO LODGING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5456

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDRA BEGA

Defendants

ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC

SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETAREH LAW GROUP

9454 Wilshire Blvd Suite 907

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN

16633 Ventura Boulevard 11Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 06/09/17 AS TO H. SCOTT LEVIANT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 06/09/17 AS TO H. SCOTT LEVIANT, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP.

LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL RE: APRIL 26, 2017 OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL RE: APRIL 26, 2017 OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL 04/26/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL 04/26/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; DECLARATION OF H. SCOTT LEVIANT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR; THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOCUMENT NEEDS TO HAVE 2 ORIGINAL SIGNATURES ONE FOR THE FILING DOCUMENT; AND ONE ON THE PROOF OF SERVICE SEE RED CHECK MARKS.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SANDRA BEGA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SANDRA BEGA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160923-0088 $435.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION / TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER STACI MORAN 11865; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; H SCOTT LEVIANT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SANDRA BEGA.; SUSANNE M BENDAVID APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING STATUS OF MEDIATION. DEFENSE COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT OF; RECENT SUBSTITUTION. COUNSEL WAS NOT PRESENT FOR MEDIATION BUT INDICATES DEFENDANTS ARE STILL; WILLING TO MEDIATE THE MATTER. COUNSEL HAVE AGREED TO DATE OF EXCHANGE AND PRIVATE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITHOUT MEDIATOR. COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THE CLASS HAS NOT BEEN; CERTIFIED AT THIS TIME.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF MEDIATION / TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING AEGIS LAW GROUP, LLP WITH LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL & HARLAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; (JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT: CLERKS CALENDAR HELD); CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; WILLIAM PAO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SANDRA BEGA.; JONATHAN JACOBS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF /BY AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES ARE DISCUSSING MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA GIULIANY 13842; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; H. SCOTT LEVIANT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SANDRA BEGA.; THOMAS SHOW APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THIS IS A PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION MATTER. COUNSEL ARE WORKING ON LOCATING A MEDIATOR WITH WAGE AND; HOUR CLASS ACTION EXPERIENCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0402 $3.00; 170728-0402-VS Reference Number 033-0027460911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DEFENDANT ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 06/09/17 AS TO H. SCOTT LEVIANT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SANDRA BEGA FOR FAX FEES FOR PROOF & MAILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161018-0912 $7.69; 161018-0912-MC Reference Number 025-0058859571

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SANDRA BEGA FOR FAX FILLING; Minutes; Receipt: 161014-0469 $7.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUN DEVELOPEMENT &MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/16 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SANDRA BEGA FOR FAXES; Minutes; Receipt: 160923-0092 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160923-0088 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.