This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 02:59:22 (UTC).

BEDROS -V- WICR, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 BEDROS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WICR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Poncin, Lynn and Davis, Keith D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8118

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Poncin, Lynn

Davis, Keith D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTROS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

WICR WATERPROOFINGAND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Yet Classified

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

WANKE, INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL, RESIDENTIAL

WANKE INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL, INC

MOES 1-100

SEXTON, DAN

CONV

Not Classified By Court

W.I.C.R., INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMASSIAN THROCKMORTON & INOUYE LLP

2 Corporate Park Suite 210

Irvine, CA 92606

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara

Other Attorneys

TOMASSIAN,THROCKMORTON, INOUYE & GRIGORIAN LLP

Attorney at TOMASSIAN,THROCKMORTON, INOUYE & GRIGORIAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Stipulation & Order filed

06/14/2021: Stipulation & Order filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

11/09/2020: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON DAN SE

10/29/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON DAN SE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING ON FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFEREN

10/05/2020: NOTICE OF RULING ON FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFEREN

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WICR

09/24/2020: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WICR

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANTR

09/24/2020: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANTR

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

09/21/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE D

09/17/2020: AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE D

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WICR WATERPRO

08/11/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WICR WATERPRO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UN

08/11/2020: CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UN

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WICR WATERPRO

08/11/2020: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WICR WATERPRO

ANSWER FILED BY WICR WATERPROOFINGAND CONSTRUCTION

08/11/2020: ANSWER FILED BY WICR WATERPROOFINGAND CONSTRUCTION

ANSWER FILED BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMP

08/11/2020: ANSWER FILED BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMP

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO PLA'S SAC FILED.

07/17/2020: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO PLA'S SAC FILED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-DEF WICR WATERPRO

06/30/2020: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-DEF WICR WATERPRO

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING

06/19/2020: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING DATE RE- DEMURRER TO SAC FILED B

05/29/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING DATE RE- DEMURRER TO SAC FILED B

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order filed; Comment: RE: To Continue the Trial Dates and Corresponding Pretrial Deadlines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialWICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-34999; southern california legal; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialWICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $20.00 CK paid on 06/11/21 for STIP fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE BEDROS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2020-00268; ANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE BEDROS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE; $17.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE BEDROS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE; Transaction Assessment; $17.77

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued; Comment: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF ANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY ANTRANIK AGOP BEDROS AND LESLIE LORRAINE FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 190620-0540-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190620-0540-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 9614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTIES MUST BE LISTED EXACTLY AS IS ON COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where WICR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WANKE INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL INC. is a litigant