This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 22:40:44 (UTC).

BECHAROFF -V- JONES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 BECHAROFF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5769

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION

Defendants

ADETRA JONES

WINNER INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL & TOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER & BREWER

4533 Mac Arthur Blvd Suite 707

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BREWER & NABAVI WITH BREWER & BREWER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 11/07/11; JUDGMENT FOR: BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WINNER INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL & TOOL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $34,112.10 INTEREST $7,831.78 ATTORNEY FEES $2,223.36 COSTS $526.22 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $44,693.46; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON WINNER INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL & TOOL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER RACHEL ESPARZA 11963; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; LANCE BREWER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WINNER INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL & TOOL; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS RECEIVED IN THE CLERKS OFFICE ON 11-1-2011 AND IS BEING REVIEWED AND; PROCESSED AT THIS TIME.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF CLERKS JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; THE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:; INTEREST RATE IS THE DEFAULT RATE OF 10.00% UNLESS A COPY OF THE AGREEMENT STATING 12.2%; SIGNED BY DEFENDANT IS PROVIDED, OR A COPY OF THE BANK STATEMENT MAILED TO THE DEFENDANT; REFLECTING 12.2%. A DOCUMENT PREPARED ON ATTORNEY LETTERHEAD IS NOT ACCEPTABLE AS A; STATEMENT FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING THE INTEREST RATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2011
  • UPDATE DISPOSITION OF ADETRA JONES TO BANKRUPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE, MEETING OF CREDITORS FILED BY ADETRA JONES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY ADETRA JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WINNER INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL & TOOL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/29/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ADETRA JONES SERVED ON 05/09/11 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0159 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF BECHAROFF CAPITAL CORPORATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less