This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 18:45:57 (UTC).

BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO -N- SERAFIN DATU CARDENO

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO -N- SERAFIN DATU CARDENO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6821

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO

Respondent

SERAFIN DATU CARDENO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2017
  • RFO IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED FEES OF $525.00, ALSO NEED A SUB OF ATTY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/09/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/08/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON SERAFIN DATU CARDENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF BEATRIZ CARDENO FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF BEATRIZ CARDENO ORDERED ENTERED 09/28/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170912-0300 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SERAFIN DATU CARDENO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/07/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SERAFIN DATU CARDENO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF BEATRIZ CARDENO AS TO SERAFIN DATU CARDENO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BEATRIZ TONGCO CARDENO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.