This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:14:35 (UTC).

BEAR CAVE HOLDINGS -V- GOFORTH

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 BEAR CAVE HOLDINGS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOFORTH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1551

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ

Defendant

RICHARD GOFORTH

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DAVID PHILIPSON

P.O. Box 2950

Big Bear, CA 92315

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0462 $25.00; 170823-0462-CK Reference Number 6909

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 03:36; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID PHILLIPSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ REPRESENTED BY BENJAMIN MASTERS.; DEFENDANT RICHARD GOFORTH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; WITNESS -- BENJAMIN MASTERS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- RICHARD GOFORTH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ ORDERED ENTERED 08/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD GOFORTH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $325.00 AND DAMAGES $274.89.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,599.89; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RICHARD GOFORTH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 07/20/17 AS TO DAVID PHILLIPSON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 07/20/17 AS TO DAVID PHILLIPSON, FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY RICHARD GOFORTH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY RICHARD GOFORTH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/16/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/16/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RICHARD GOFORTH; PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RICHARD GOFORTH; PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0377 $255.00; 170711-0377-CK Reference Number 6800

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0462 $25.00; 170823-0462-CK Reference Number 6909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0432 $25.00; 170823-0432-CK Reference Number 6908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 03:36; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID PHILLIPSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ REPRESENTED BY BENJAMIN MASTERS.; DEFENDANT RICHARD GOFORTH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; WITNESS -- BENJAMIN MASTERS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- RICHARD GOFORTH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ ORDERED ENTERED 08/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD GOFORTH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $325.00 AND DAMAGES $274.89.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,599.89; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RICHARD GOFORTH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RICHARD GOFORTH; PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF BEAR CAVE HOLDINGSLLC BY AND DULY AUTHORIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM RICHARD GOFORTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $6,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $16.67.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0377 $255.00; 170711-0377-CK Reference Number 6800

    Read MoreRead Less