This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:48:39 (UTC).

LASQUADE -V- FORD MOTOR CO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 LASQUADE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FORD MOTOR CO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1615

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH LASQUADE

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARECORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO STANCROFF PC

360 N. Sepulveda Blvd Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

ERSKINE LAW GROUP PC

342 South Main St

Rochester, MI 48307

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0278 $435.00; 160201-0278-CK Reference Number 7741

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • HEARING RE: STATUS RE: COORDINATION/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY WHELAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DEBORAH LASQUADE.; ATTORNEY MELISSA TRPCEVSKI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INFORM THE COURT THAT THE PETITION REGARDING COORDINATION WAS DENIED, AND ALSO THAT; THERE IS CURRENTLY A PRIVATE MEDIATION SET.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 03/23/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/27/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S23 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER KERRI DAVERSA 13882; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PATRICK WHALEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DEBORAH LASQUADE.; ATTORNEY MELISSA TRPCEVSKI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: MATTER TO BE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN LOS ANGELES; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS RE: COORDINATION/TRIAL SETTING SET FOR 09/30/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DEBORAH LASQUADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DEBORAH LASQUADE.; Minutes; Receipt: 160720-0095 $150.00; 160720-0095-CK Reference Number 432201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/03/16 WITH COSTS OF $25.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-2561 $435.00; 160209-2561-CK Reference Number 093489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY,A DELAWARECORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ERSKINE LAW GROUP PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0278 $435.00; 160201-0278-CK Reference Number 7741

    Read MoreRead Less