This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

BBK PACIFIC V ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 BBK PACIFIC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1850

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BBK PACIFIC, LLC

Defendants

TERRANCE ANDERSON

TANIKAWA ANDERSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF BBK PACIFIC, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: BBK PACIFIC, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,065.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $990.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,030.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BBK PACIFIC, LLC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BBK PACIFIC, LLC.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF BBK PACIFIC, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BBK PACIFIC, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF BBK PACIFIC, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BBK PACIFIC, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERRANCE ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERRANCE ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TANIKAWA ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TANIKAWA ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0619 $255.00; 170801-0619-CK Reference Number 1176583

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF BBK PACIFIC, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: BBK PACIFIC, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TANIKAWA ANDERSON, TERRANCE ANDERSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,065.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $990.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,030.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 09/13/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $575.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BBK PACIFIC, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERRANCE ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TANIKAWA ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF BBK PACIFIC, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,065.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.50.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0619 $255.00; 170801-0619-CK Reference Number 1176583

    Read MoreRead Less