This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 05:05:13 (UTC).

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc. et al -v- Amazon.com Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Baxter, Bailey, Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amazon com Services, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5448

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc

A Corporation

DMG Consulting & Development

Family Genesis

Fergo Trucking

Triumph Business Capital

Terglau, Inc

Defendants

Amazon.com Services, Inc

Sharkninja Sales Company

Southland Transportation Co

F&M Transportation

A Delaware Corporation

A North Carolina Corporation

A Florida Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT LAW

Attorney at GRANT LAW

 

Court Documents

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

04/08/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

03/03/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

02/03/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

02/02/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

01/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

11/24/2020: Notice of Hearing Sent

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

11/24/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

Certificate of Assignment Received

11/24/2020: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

11/24/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint Filed

11/24/2020: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; DMG Consulting & Development; Family Genesis; Fergo Trucking; Triumph Business Capital; Terglau, Inc.; Amazon.com Services, Inc.; Sharkninja Sales Company; Southland Transportation Co; F&M Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 12/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialBaxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; Turbo Court; Receipt # SC-2020-02214; Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialBaxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialBaxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 Turbo Court paid on 11/25/2020 for First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH BUSINESS CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where a North Carolina corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Southland Transportation Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SharkNinja Sales Company is a litigant