This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 09:12:29 (UTC).

BARSTOW SUNCREST-V-JONES

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 BARSTOW SUNCREST-V-JONES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3091

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P

Defendant

KIZZIE JONES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 12/21/16 AS TO KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 12/21/16 AS TO KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P REPRESENTED BY PERLA ORTIZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIZZIE JONES; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; KIZZIE JONES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- PERLA ORTIZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- MICHELLE WOODS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KIZZIE JONES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $662.07.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,517.07; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KIZZIE JONES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

ANSWER FILED BY KIZZIE JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY KIZZIE JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIZZIE JONES; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIZZIE JONES; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170105-0784 $25.00; 170105-0784-CK Reference Number 528676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P REPRESENTED BY PERLA ORTIZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIZZIE JONES; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; KIZZIE JONES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- PERLA ORTIZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- MICHELLE WOODS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KIZZIE JONES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $662.07.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,517.07; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KIZZIE JONES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL RECEIVED BACK FROM KIZZIE JONES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY KIZZIE JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/16/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIZZIE JONES; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF BARSTOW SUNCREST APARTMENTS L.P, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0641 $255.00; 161214-0641-CK Reference Number 4907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.83.--BEGINNING ON 12/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.